HI SB985 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 045, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 045, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Pearl Harbor Floating Drydock, LLC, for the construction of a purpose-built floating drydock at Pearl Harbor to service submarines and surface ships. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Pearl Harbor Floating Drydock, Llc.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 045, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 045, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71). |
2019-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Cullen, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 550). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1971), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McDermott. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).