HI SB989 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 228, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 228, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Hawaii Television and Film Development Special Fund as the Hawaii Film and Creative Industries Development Special Fund and expands its funding sources and purposes. Appropriates funds for the UH creative media program. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 228, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 228, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 185) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 185). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Luke, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 12:50PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:50PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 12:50PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; J.Keohokalole, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1991) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McDermott. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2019-03-14 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EDB/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2019-03-11 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 320) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1046) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DBEDT
Hawaii Film and Creative Industries Development Special Fund
Hawaii Television and Film Development Board
UH Creative Media Program
DBEDT
Hawaii Film and Creative Industries Development Special Fund
Hawaii Television and Film Development Board
UH Creative Media Program