HI SB993 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 201, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 201, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Department of Agriculture's agricultural loan program by adding farm innovation loan and expanding the definition of a new farmer. (CD1)
Title
Agricultural Loans; New Farmer; Farm Innovation
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 201, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 201, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 85) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 85). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ohno. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Ohno, Cheape. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 447). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB771 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 5