HI SB998 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc.; Maui Electric Company, Limited; and Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc., to fund multi-project capital improvement programs and assist utilities serving the general public in providing electric energy. (SB998 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds For Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc.; Maui Electric Company, Limited; And Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and Excused: none.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:35AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback