HI SB999 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB999
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii aerospace development corporation to grow investments and job opportunities in the aerospace industry and for workforce development. Transfers all rights, powers, functions, and duties of the office of aerospace development and Pacific international space center for exploration systems to the Hawaii aerospace development corporation. Repeals the office of aerospace development and Pacific international space center for exploration systems.
Title
Relating To Development Of The Aerospace Industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
Subjects
Established
Hawaii Aerospace Development Corporation
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer
Hawaii Aerospace Development Corporation
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=999&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB999_.HTM |