HI SCR10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR10
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Possibility Of Updating "hawaii School For The Deaf And The Blind" To "hawaii School For The Deaf" To Reduce Confusion And Identify Where Students Who Are Blind May Access Appropriate Resources And Services.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Possibility Of Updating "hawaii School For The Deaf And The Blind" To "hawaii School For The Deaf" To Reduce Confusion And Identify Where Students Who Are Blind May Access Appropriate Resources And Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR10 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HCR75 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR75 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=10&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR10_.HTM |