HI SCR10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR10
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to HSH/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to HSH/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Human Services Provide An Estimate Of The Budget Appropriation And Legislative Action Necessary To Fund An Expansion Of Med-quest Coverage To All Post-partum Women For A Period Of Twelve Months Following Childbirth.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Human Services Provide An Estimate Of The Budget Appropriation And Legislative Action Necessary To Fund An Expansion Of Med-quest Coverage To All Post-partum Women For A Period Of Twelve Months Following Childbirth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to HSH/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3036) with recommendation of adoption. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR10 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HCR16 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR16 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39