HI SCR101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Study And Make Recommendations On The Current Use And Possible Expansion Of Services At Leahi Hospital And Maluhia Hospital, Including The Feasibility Of Using The Hospitals As Centers For Community-based Mental Health And Substance Abuse Treatment Services For Non-forensic Patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Study And Make Recommendations On The Current Use And Possible Expansion Of Services At Leahi Hospital And Maluhia Hospital, Including The Feasibility Of Using The Hospitals As Centers For Community-based Mental Health And Substance Abuse Treatment Services For Non-forensic Patients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1647), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback