HI SCR104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Care Coverage Of Cannabidiol Oil Derived From Industrial Hemp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Care Coverage Of Cannabidiol Oil Derived From Industrial Hemp.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-14SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback