HI SCR106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Information Practices To Explore A Trial Appeals Resolution Process With A Randomly Chosen Selection Of All Incoming Public Appeals.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Information Practices To Explore A Trial Appeals Resolution Process With A Randomly Chosen Selection Of All Incoming Public Appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR106 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=106&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR106_.HTM |