HI SCR108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Include Resident Citizens Of The Freely Associated States Who Lawfully Reside In The United States As "qualified Aliens" Under The Personal Responsibility And Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act Of 1996 In Recognizing Their Unique Historic And Ongoing Sacrifices And Contributions To The United States Of America.
Title
Freely Associated States; Medicaid Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 721). |
2013-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll excused (2). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 57 |
2013-04-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 04-19-13 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-13. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from TIA/HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Green. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi, Solomon. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:34PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TIA/HMS/PSM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |