HI SCR108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing Support For A Motor Vehicle Racetrack Or Race Way Park On Oahu And Requesting The Department Of Public Safety, Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, And The City And County Of Honolulu To Facilitate And Approve Its Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing Support For A Motor Vehicle Racetrack Or Race Way Park On Oahu And Requesting The Department Of Public Safety, Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, And The City And County Of Honolulu To Facilitate And Approve Its Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2268) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted with Senators English, Ihara, Nishihara, Rhoads, Riviere, Shimabukuro, and Thielen voting "Aye, with reservations"; and Senators Baker, Fevella, Gabbard, Harimoto, Inouye, Kim, and Moriwaki voting "No". Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1569), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR42 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback