HI SCR109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Re-Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-sixth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And The Fortieth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-sixth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And The Fortieth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRe-Referred to LCA.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to LCA/WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR33 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Referred to LCA.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback