HI SCR111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR111
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Medical Cannabis Insurance Reimbursement Working Group To Continue Its Work To Address The Complexities Surrounding Medical Cannabis Reimbursements By Health Insurance.
Title
Requesting The Medical Cannabis Insurance Reimbursement Working Group To Continue Its Work To Address The Complexities Surrounding Medical Cannabis Reimbursements By Health Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2224), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Mizuno, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1689) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR111 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR199 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR199 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=111&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR111_.HTM |