HI SCR112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 962).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Comprehensive Performance And Management Audit Of The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Environmental Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Comprehensive Performance And Management Audit Of The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Environmental Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 962).
2019-04-25SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-24SenateDeferred One Day 04-25-19.
2019-04-23SenateDeferred One Day 04-24-19.
2019-04-23SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 845).
2019-04-22HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-22HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
2019-04-22HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-15-19.
2019-04-18HouseRe-referred to HLT, referral sheet 55
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2254) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 565) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1712) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR23 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback