HI SCR113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The Executive Office On Aging Update The 2013 White Paper On Active Aging And Provide A Final Report On Its Updated Version No Later Than The Start Of The Regular Session Of 2022.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2238) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-15SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to CPH/HMS.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR209 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback