HI SCR119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study Of The Potential Regulation Of Unaccredited Degree Granting Institutions In The State.
Title
Unaccredited Universities and Colleges
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 732). |
2013-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1762), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-23 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Takai. |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 57 |
2013-04-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 04-23-13 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HED, LMG, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 651) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1433) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HRE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-28-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HRE/CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=119&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR119_.HTM |