HI SCR119 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR119
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Energy Office, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, To Create And Implement A Strategic Plan To Increase Renewable Energy And Local Food Production And Create An Economic Impact Report Based On Implementation Of The Strategic Plan.
Title
Requesting The State Energy Office, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, To Create And Implement A Strategic Plan To Increase Renewable Energy And Local Food Production And Create An Economic Impact Report Based On Implementation Of The Strategic Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 836). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2287), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2255), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Friday, 04-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 617) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1834) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR119 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Department of Agriculture
Economic Impact Report
Local Food Production
Renewable Energy
State Energy Office
Strategic Plan
Economic Impact Report
Local Food Production
Renewable Energy
State Energy Office
Strategic Plan