HI SCR120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Evaluate The Implementation Of A Plan To Promote Greater Awareness Of Dyslexia And Provide Comprehensive Support For Students With Dyslexia And Other Literacy Challenges.
Title
Dyslexia; Board of Education; Department of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 733). |
2013-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from EDN/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1760), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape. |
2013-04-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN/HED on Thursday, 04-18-13 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to EDN/HED, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-10-13 9:51AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Ige. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 1:50PM in conference room Auditorium. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=120&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR120_.HTM |