HI SCR129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development; Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Title
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development; Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1791) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
HCR59 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR59 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=129&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR129_.HTM |