HI SCR137 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Coordinator On Homelessness To Assemble A Working Group To Identify Innovative Housing Solutions For Homeless Native Hawaiian Families; Investigate Suitable And Available Federal, State, County, And Private Land For Innovative Housing Projects; And Prepare A Plan To Develop A Demonstration Housing Project For Homeless Native Hawaiian Families That Can Serve As A Model Statewide.
Title
Homeless; Native Hawaiians; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 781). |
2013-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita. |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-29-13 9:05AM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1766), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-24 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale. |
2013-04-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1725), recommending referral to OMH. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-04-17 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HSG, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 662) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HMS/THA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/THA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS/THA/WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=137&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR137_.HTM |