HI SCR140 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Respond To Kpmg's Recommendations Regarding Improvements To The Department's Operations And Workflow.
Title
DOE Pilot Project; Moanalua Complex; Response to Review
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and M. Oshiro, Takai excused. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1373-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Hanohano, Nakashima, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Chang, Manahan, Rhoads, Yamane. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-16-10 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 69 | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 03-31-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2896) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-10 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |