HI SCR141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 63
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 63
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring The First Week Of October As Hawaii Fishing And Seafood Week.
Title
Hawaii Fishing and Seafood Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 63 | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) One Day Notice 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Reported from EDT/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3160) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Solomon. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to EDT/WLH. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |