HI SCR141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting County District Health Officers To Convene A Regional Cesspool Modernization Task Force Within Each County Of The State.
Title
Requesting County District Health Officers To Convene A Regional Cesspool Modernization Task Force Within Each County Of The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 533) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3445) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM deferred the measure until 03-27-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR141 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR111 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR111 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).