HI SCR141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR141
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands For A Rubble Rock Revetment, Rock Wall, And Two Concrete Stairways, And For Use, Maintenance, Repair, Replacement, And Removal Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands For A Rubble Rock Revetment, Rock Wall, And Two Concrete Stairways, And For Use, Maintenance, Repair, Replacement, And Removal Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3818) with recommendation of adoption. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 06-26-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR141 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Referred to EDU.