HI SCR145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Forestry And Wildlife In The County Of Hawaii To Prioritize The Control Of High-threat Invasive Species.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Forestry And Wildlife In The County Of Hawaii To Prioritize The Control Of High-threat Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-12-19 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR145 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).