HI SCR169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 634).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 634).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State To Modernize Its Disaster Preparedness Plans.
Title
Requesting The State To Modernize Its Disaster Preparedness Plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 729). |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727). |
2017-04-28 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Ito, Cullen Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-04-28 | House | Re-referred to PBS, VMI, FIN, referral sheet 48 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | All Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Nishihara discharged as Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Co-Chair. Senator Baker discharged as Conferee. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Baker. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-27-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-26-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-25-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 593). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1803) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-04-13 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-13-17 2:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 2:00pm. |
2017-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-13-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 475) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1437) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR169 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 634).