HI SCR169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating April As Donate Life Month In Hawaii.
Title
Designating April As Donate Life Month In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2253), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 573) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1694) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR169 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR201 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-Referred to CPH.
HCR201 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-Referred to CPH.