HI SCR170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Dedicate One Private Room In The Hawaii State Capitol Building For Employees And Visitors To Breastfeed Or Express Milk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Dedicate One Private Room In The Hawaii State Capitol Building For Employees And Visitors To Breastfeed Or Express Milk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1587), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR92 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback