HI SCR174 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to WLO/INT, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to WLO/INT, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of Koreatown And Development Of A Master Plan For The Development Of A Koreatown.
Title
Koreatown; Office of Planning; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to WLO/INT, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WLH/TSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3466) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/TSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Re-Referred to WLH/TSM/TIA. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH/TIA. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |