HI SCR174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 42
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Assist The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs In Providing An Easement To The Agribusiness Development Corporation For Water Irrigation Infrastructure.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Assist The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs In Providing An Easement To The Agribusiness Development Corporation For Water Irrigation Infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1452) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-17 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR174 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 42
Subjects
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Agricultural Land
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Water Irrigation Infrastructure
Agricultural Land
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Water Irrigation Infrastructure
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=174&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR174_.HTM |