HI SCR174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR174
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study On The Significance Of Traditional Hawaiian Practices, Including The Makahiki, And Their Effect On The Perpetuation Of Native Hawaiian Culture.
Title
Requesting A Study On The Significance Of Traditional Hawaiian Practices, Including The Makahiki, And Their Effect On The Perpetuation Of Native Hawaiian Culture.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 842). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2298), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2264), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2019-04-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-19. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR174 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR132 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR132 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=174&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR174_.HTM |