HI SCR175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The State To Convene An Artificial Intelligence Advisory Committee To Investigate How To Implement, Develop, And Regulate Artificial Intelligence In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The State To Convene An Artificial Intelligence Advisory Committee To Investigate How To Implement, Develop, And Regulate Artificial Intelligence In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2247) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:45AM in conference room 309.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 576).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from TEC/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to TEC/CPH.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR129 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback