HI SCR18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Build Alternative Housing Options For Lessees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Build Alternative Housing Options For Lessees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on HWN deferred the measure.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:16PM in conference room 016.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2019-01-28SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR151 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback