HI SCR181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Mortgage Foreclosure Fraud Task Force To Develop Recommendations To Improve Mortgage Fraud Protections For Consumers.
Title
Requesting The Director Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Mortgage Foreclosure Fraud Task Force To Develop Recommendations To Improve Mortgage Fraud Protections For Consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR181 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=181&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR181_.HTM |