HI SCR182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Rename The University Of Hawaii Institute For Astronomy To The Paul H.i. Coleman Astronomy Center.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Rename The University Of Hawaii Institute For Astronomy To The Paul H.i. Coleman Astronomy Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 484). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3375) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=182&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR182_.HTM |