HI SCR182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committee(s) on EEP/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing The Importance Of The State's Pollinator Species, The Threat That Systemic Insecticides Pose To Such Species, And Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The Department Of Agriculture To Take Measures To Limit Pollinator Exposure To Neonicotinoids.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing The Importance Of The State's Pollinator Species, The Threat That Systemic Insecticides Pose To Such Species, And Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The Department Of Agriculture To Take Measures To Limit Pollinator Exposure To Neonicotinoids.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseThe committee(s) on EEP/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Friday, 04-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1721) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to AEN/WTL.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR118 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback