HI SCR187 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Adopt The Use Of Electronic Transcripts.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Adopt The Use Of Electronic Transcripts.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2220), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2019-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-19. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR187 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=187&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR187_.HTM |