HI SCR189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR189
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study On The State Comprehensive Emergency Medical Services System To Identify Issues And Problems And Propose Initiatives To Improve The System.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study On The State Comprehensive Emergency Medical Services System To Identify Issues And Problems And Propose Initiatives To Improve The System.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR189 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.