HI SCR19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kukuiula, Koloa, Kauai, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Rock Seawall, And For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
BLNR; Issuance of a Term, Non-Exclusive Easement; State Submerged Lands at Kukuiula, Koloa, Kauai; Maintenance and Repair of Existing Rock Seawall
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 643). |
2016-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1767-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tokioka, Ward. |
2016-04-20 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-22-16 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5). |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-04-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen. |
2016-04-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen. |
2016-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Thursday, 04-14-16 10:45AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 43 |
2016-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-16. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3270) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2834), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR27 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Referred to WLA, WAM.