HI SCR196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism Convene An International Moon Base Alliance Committee To Provide Recommendations And Guidance For The Development Of Evolvable Lunar Architecture On The Island Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism Convene An International Moon Base Alliance Committee To Provide Recommendations And Guidance For The Development Of Evolvable Lunar Architecture On The Island Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR229 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback