HI SCR20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved, And Convene A Task Force To Review The Efficacy Of Such Forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved, And Convene A Task Force To Review The Efficacy Of Such Forms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/TIA on Friday, 04-12-19 9:50AM in conference room 312.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to AGR/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 588) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1848) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-08SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-08SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-19 1:20PM in conference room 224.
2019-02-28SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReferred to EET/AEN, WAM.
2019-02-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR25 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback