HI SCR204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957).
2019-04-24SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-24SenateFinal Adoption.
2019-04-23SenateOne Day Notice 04-24-19.
2019-04-23SenateSenate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-24-19.
2019-04-22SenateDeferred One Day 04-23-19.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 822).
2019-04-18HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-18HouseAdopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Holt, McDermott, Ohno, Todd excused (5).
2019-04-18HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2283) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
2019-04-17HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey.
2019-04-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-17-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2273) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 641).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from HWN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-29-19 9:31AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HWN/JDC.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR155 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback