HI SCR21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Exchange And Sale Of Property Between The State Of Hawaii And Napoleon, Et Al., Approved By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources At Its Meeting On June 8, 2012, Under Agenda Item D-11.
Title
Action Taken BLNR on Land Exchange and Sale of Property
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 749). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-25-13. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Deferred until 04-24-13. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 725). |
2013-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-22 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Carroll excused (2). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 58 |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Coffman, Hanohano, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-04-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-18-13 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, English, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 870), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:25PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR26 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Oshiro excused (3).