HI SCR230 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Dispose Of The Long-term Water Rights Leases For Hawaiian Electric's Non-consumptive Water Use Along The Wailuku River By Direct Negotiation And Provide Guidance On Determining The Value Of The Annual Water Lease Rent.
Title
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Dispose Of The Long-term Water Rights Leases For Hawaiian Electric's Non-consumptive Water Use Along The Wailuku River By Direct Negotiation And Provide Guidance On Determining The Value Of The Annual Water Lease Rent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 06-29-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=230&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR230_.HTM |