HI SCR24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR24
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 19 As Hawaii Celebrating Women In Public Office Day.
Title
Recognizing March 19 As Hawaii Celebrating Women In Public Office Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386). |
2018-03-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1516-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 435) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-18. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2940) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR24 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR61 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR61 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39