HI SCR26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Counties Of The State Of Hawaii To Implement Procedures Or Technologies To Ease The Process In Which Driver's Licenses Are Renewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Counties Of The State Of Hawaii To Implement Procedures Or Technologies To Ease The Process In Which Driver's Licenses Are Renewed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to PSM/TRS, WAM.
2019-02-28SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR99 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback