HI SCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-23SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 832).
2019-04-22HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-22HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
2019-04-22HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2294), recommending adoption.
2019-04-18HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2263), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1813) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
2019-02-28SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR48 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback