HI SCR34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Study To Determine Various Alternatives For The Rehabilitation And Renovation Of The State Capitol Reflecting Pool.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Study To Determine Various Alternatives For The Rehabilitation And Renovation Of The State Capitol Reflecting Pool.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1640), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback