HI SCR37 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Consider Whether Stranded Costs Are A Significant Factor In The Electric Utilities' Failure To Retire Old, Oil-fired Generation Plants And Any Appropriate Measures That Would Encourage Electric Utilities To Retire Old, Oil-fired Generation Plants And The Potential Impact This Would Have On Ratepayers.
Title
Stranded Cost Recovery Mechanism; Public Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 770). |
2013-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1786), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita. |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-29-13 9:05AM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ward excused (1). |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1744), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Evans, Hanohano, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Friday, 04-19-13 8:45AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 3:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=37&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR37_.HTM |